OR HB2549 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Oregon State Lottery Commission to issue registrations to fantasy contest operators to organize or offer fantasy contests. Directs commission to adopt rules related to fantasy contests. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to fantasy contests; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jodi Hack [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2549 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2549/Introduced |