OR HB2547 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund for operation of Gatekeeper program by NorthWest Senior and Disability Services agency. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to programs that serve seniors; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |