OR HB2547 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 719, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 719, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Task Force on Housing with Services. Specifies membership and duties. Requires report to interim committees related to human services and housing no later than December 1, 2015. Sunsets task force December 31, 2015. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to housing; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Val Hoyle [D] | Rep. Vic Gilliam [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Consumer Protection and Government Effectiveness (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Consumer Protection and Government Effectiveness (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 719, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hoyle. Passed.Ayes, 49; Nays, 11--Barreto, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Heard, Parrish, Post, Sprenger, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson. |
2015-06-29 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-06-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-22 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-06-11 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |