OR HB2546 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Chapter 158, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 26, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Defines "inhalant delivery system." Amends laws concerning sale of tobacco products to, and use of tobacco products by, minors so those laws equally apply to inhalant delivery systems. Provides for further regulation of inhalant delivery systems. Expands scope of offense of endangering welfare of a minor from knowingly causing sale of tobacco products to minors to knowingly allowing sale of tobacco products to minors and adds distribution and sale of inhalant delivery systems. For purposes of Oregon Indoor Clean Air Act, defines "inhalant." Makes prohibitions of Oregon Indoor Clean Air Act apply to inhalants. Makes certain other changes to Oregon Indoor Clean Air Act. Makes amendments to Oregon Indoor Clean Air Act operative on January 1, 2016. Repeals laws related to smoking in public that are duplicative or inconsistent with provisions of Oregon Indoor Clean Air Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage. .

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to inhalants; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-14 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-01HouseChapter 158, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 26, 2015.
2015-05-26HouseGovernor signed.
2015-05-19SenatePresident signed.
2015-05-19HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-05-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 3--Keny-Guyer, McLane, Weidner.
2015-05-11SenateVote explanations filed by Boquist, Knopp.
2015-05-11SenateThird reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward, Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 22; nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen.
2015-05-11SenateMotion to rerefer to committee on Health Care failed.Ayes, 12; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney.
2015-05-07SenateSecond reading.
2015-05-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2015-05-04SenateWork Session held.
2015-04-22SenateWork Session held.
2015-03-23SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-03-09SenateReferred to Health Care.
2015-03-03SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-03-02HouseThird reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Nearman, Weidner; Excused, 2--Esquivel, Gorsek.
2015-02-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2015 Calendar.
2015-02-25HouseSecond reading.
2015-02-24HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2015-02-20HouseWork Session held.
2015-02-09HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-01-16HouseReferred to Health Care.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2546
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2546/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2546/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2546/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2546/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2546/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2546/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20862
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=331166
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/22178
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=349127
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=350239

Bill Comments 750

feedback