OR HB2545 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-8)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 718, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-8)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 718, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school district to provide lunch free of charge to students who are eligible for reduced price lunches. Directs Department of Education to reimburse school district for actual amount student would have been required to pay. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to school lunches; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 718, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Boquist, Thatcher; excused, 2--Olsen, Shields. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2015-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-19 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-06 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |