OR HB2542 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Chapter 124, (2013 Laws): Effective date May 16, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Increases period of revocation of driving privileges to three years if person convicted of failure to perform duties of driver causes serious physical injury to another.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to revocation of driving privileges for failure to perform the duties of a driver; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-16HouseChapter 124, (2013 Laws): Effective date May 16, 2013.
2013-05-16HouseGovernor signed.
2013-05-13SenatePresident signed.
2013-05-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-05-07SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Beyer, Johnson, Kruse.
2013-05-06SenateSecond reading.
2013-05-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2013-04-30SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2013-03-18SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2013-03-12SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2013-03-11HouseThird reading. Carried by Garrett. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, Matthews, Weidner.
2013-03-07HouseSecond reading.
2013-03-06HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2013-03-04HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2013-01-22HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2013-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback