OR HB2541 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that licensed optometrist may perform specified ophthalmic surgery procedures. Provides that licensed optometrist may perform specified ophthalmic surgery procedures. Defines "ophthalmic surgery." Removes requirement that optometrist treating patient with antiglaucoma medication consult with ophthalmologist. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to optometry; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2541 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2541/Introduced |