OR HB2539 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 295, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 295, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that juror may not be identified by name in court proceeding open to public. Provides that juror may not be identified by name in court proceeding open to public. Directs court to ensure that parties have access to names of jurors unless court determines that there is good cause to order otherwise.
Title
Relating to jurors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 295, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Wright. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused, 11--Bonham, Bynum, Clem, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Williams, Zika. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |