OR HB2536 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Public Places Are Safe Places Investment Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to Office of Emergency Management for implementation of strategies for identifying and developing staging areas for emergency response. Creates advisory committee within office to provide recommendations and advice regarding expenditures from fund.
Title
Relating to development of staging areas for emergency response.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |