OR HB2536 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 736, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 736, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies laws relating to transfers of structured settlement payment rights.
Title
Relating to transfers of structured settlement rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 736, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Senate adopted Conference Committee Report and repassed bill. Ayes, 18; nays, 12--Baertschiger, Boquist, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Whitsett, Winters. |
2013-07-01 | House | House adopted Conference Committee Report. Ayes, 51; Nays, 6--Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Huffman, Olson, Whisnant; Excused, 2--Bailey, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read in Senate. |
2013-06-28 | House | Conference Committee Recommendation: House concur in Senate amendments dated June 5, 2013 and bill be further amended and repassed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Senators Close, Prozanski, Roblan appointed Senate conferees. |
2013-06-21 | House | Representatives Holvey, Chair; Barton, Richardson appointed House conferees. |
2013-06-14 | House | House refused to concur in Senate amendments. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 16; nays, 14--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Taken from 06-10 Calendar and placed on 06-12 Calendar on voice vote. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 25--Barker, Boone, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Matthews, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Vega Pederson, Weidner, Whisnant; Excused, 1--Berger. |
2013-04-24 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-02-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |