OR HB2535 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits client of temporary service provider from paying employee provided by temporary service provider directly if employee is being paid by temporary service provider.
Title
Relating to employees provided by temporary service provider.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 18--Barker, Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Sprenger, Whisnant, Whitsett. |
2013-04-24 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |