OR HB2531 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 29, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 29, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds State Forestry Department, Department of Transportation and State Department of Fish and Wildlife as consulting agencies for state pollinator health outreach and education plan. Adds State Forestry Department, Department of Transportation and State Department of Fish and Wildlife as consulting agencies for state pollinator health outreach and education plan. Requires Oregon State University and specified agencies to meet annually and confer regarding pollinator health outreach and education plan.
Title
Relating to pollinator health.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] |
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 29, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-05-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 2--Boquist, Robinson; Excused, 5--Burdick, Girod, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 1--Holvey; Excused, 11--Bonham, Bynum, Clem, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Williams, Zika. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |