OR HB2530 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 358, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals sunset on authorization to operate fixed photo radar on urban high crash corridors in City of Portland. Repeals sunset on authorization to operate fixed photo radar on urban high crash corridors in City of Portland. Authorizes cities with population of 50,000 or more to operate fixed photo radar on urban high crash corridors.].

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to use of photo radar on urban high crash corridors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 358, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
2021-06-23HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-16SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-09SenateThird reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 7--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Linthicum; Excused, 3--Heard, Kennemer, Thatcher.
2021-06-08SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-06-02SenateReferred to Transportation.
2021-05-27SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-05-27HouseThird reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 10--Evans, Holvey, Morgan, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Wallan, Witt, Wright; Excused, 2--Cate, Levy; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bynum.
2021-05-26HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-24HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-05-20HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Transportation.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback