OR HB2522 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 157, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 03, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 157, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 03, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Department of Transportation to title park model recreational vehicles based on original manufacturing. Allows Department of Transportation to title park model recreational vehicles based on original manufacturing. Becomes operative September 1, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to park model recreational vehicles; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 157, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 03, 2021. |
2021-06-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 5--Anderson, Findley, Hansell, President Courtney, Thatcher. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 48; Excused, 12--Bonham, Bynum, Clem, Evans, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Williams, Zika. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |