OR HB2520 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Higher Education Coordinating Commission to conduct study to determine whether state should recognize more than one high school equivalency test. Directs department to submit report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2020. Sunsets December 31, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to high school equivalency; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Education. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |