OR HB2518 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires pharmacy to report deidentified information to prescription monitoring program upon dispensing prescribed naloxone. Requires pharmacy to report certain other identifying information to prescription monitoring program upon dispensing prescribed controlled substance classified in schedules II through IV. Requires information to be disclosed from prescription monitoring program to medical director or pharmacy director. Requires information to be disclosed from prescription monitoring program for certain other purposes. Requires licensing information of licensees who are authorized to prescribe or dispense controlled substances to be provided to Oregon Health Authority for purpose of qualifying licensees to report information to, or receive information from, prescription monitoring program. Specifies that authority may require person requesting deidentified information from prescription monitoring program to enter into data use agreement with authority. Requires authority, not less than once per year, to develop, through use of prescription monitoring program, criteria by which practitioner may be required to receive education or training on prescribing of opioids or opiates. Creates Prescription Monitoring Program Prescribing Practices Review Subcommittee for purposes of advising authority on development of criteria, reviewing practitioner's history to determine whether practitioner meets criteria and directing authority to provide educational material to practitioner who meets criteria. Provides that authority may enter into agreements governing sharing and use of information reported to prescription monitoring program with regulatory authorities of other states that administer prescription monitoring programs. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to programs used to monitor the dispensing of prescription drugs; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Knute Buehler [R] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |