OR HB2517 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 154, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 154, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to compile and annually post to website report on information reported to authority by coordinated care organizations regarding requests for prior authorization. Requires coordinated care organizations to report specified information to] Oregon Health Authority to compile and annually post to website report on information reported to authority by coordinated care organizations regarding requests for prior authorization. Requires insurers offering health benefit plans to report specified information to Department of Consumer and Business Services regarding requests for prior authorization. Creates new requirements and modifies existing requirements applicable to utilization review by insurers offering health benefit plans and health benefit plans offered by Public Employees' Benefit Board and Oregon Educators Benefit Board. Creates new requirements applicable to step therapy requirements imposed by entities providing health insurance, medical services contracts or health care service contracts, multiple employer welfare arrangements and pharmacy benefit managers.
Title
Relating to managing the utilization of health care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 154, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Boquist, Heard; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Prusak. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 1--Nearman; Absent, 1--Wilde; Excused, 4--Levy, Morgan, Smith G, Wallan. |
2021-04-14 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |