OR HB2516 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 160, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 25, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 160, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 25, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows State Parks and Recreation Department to issue permits to entities to restore, maintain and preserve abandoned cemeteries. Allows department to adopt rules relating to issuance of permits. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to abandoned cemeteries; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 160, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 25, 2017. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Kruse, Linthicum. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 50; Nays, 9--Greenlick, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2017-03-13 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |