OR HB2510 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement that amount of net proceeds from Oregon State Lottery allocated to County Fair Account not exceed $1.53 million annually. Removes requirement that amount of net proceeds from Oregon State Lottery allocated to County Fair Account not exceed $1.53 million annually. Allocates eight-tenths of one percent of net proceeds from lottery to County Fair Account and two-tenths of one percent of net proceeds from lottery to Horse Racing Account. Requires Oregon Business Development Department to prepare and report master plan for county fairground capital construction. Specifies content and procedural requirements for report. Appropriates moneys to department out of General Fund for consultant services related to report. Establishes Horse Racing Account separate and distinct from General Fund. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to county fairs; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Small Business with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |