OR HB2510 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Third Reading. Motion to postpone to April 19, 2021 Calendar carried.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires owner or possessor of firearm to secure firearm with trigger or cable lock, in locked container or in gun room except in specified circumstances. Requires owner or possessor of firearm to secure firearm with trigger or cable lock, in locked container or in gun room except in specified circumstances. Punishes violation by maximum of $500 fine. If minor obtains unsecured firearm as result of violation, punishes by maximum of $2,000 fine. Provides that person who does not secure firearm as required is strictly liable for injury to person or property within two years after violation. Specifies exceptions to liability. Requires owner or possessor of firearm to secure firearm with trigger or cable lock or in locked container when transferring firearm under circumstances requiring criminal background check, except in specified circumstances. Punishes violation by maximum of $500 fine. Provides that person who transfers firearm without securing firearm is strictly liable for injury to person or property within two years after violation. Specifies exceptions to liability. Requires person to report loss or theft of firearm within 72 hours of time person knew or reasonably should have known of loss or theft. Punishes violation of requirement by maximum of $1,000 fine. Requires person transferring firearm to minor to directly supervise minor's use of firearm. Provides that person who does not supervise minor as required is strictly liable for injury to person or property caused by minor's use of firearm. Authorizes person to transfer supervisory duty and liability to another person. Specifies exceptions to supervision requirement and liability. Directs Oregon Health Authority to specify by rule minimum specifications for trigger and cable locks and locked containers required by Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to firearm safety requirements; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading. Motion to postpone to April 19, 2021 Calendar carried.
2021-04-10HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-08HouseCarried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseCarried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-01HouseSecond reading.
2021-03-31HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-03-30HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-11HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Health Care.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback