OR HB2509 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 434, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits retail establishments from providing single-use checkout bags to customers, except in certain cases. Prohibits restaurants from providing single-use checkout bags to customers. Requires retail establishments to charge not less than five cents each for recycled paper checkout bags, reusable fabric checkout bags or reusable plastic checkout bags provided to customers, except in certain circumstances. Requires restaurants to charge not less than five cents each for reusable plastic checkout bags provided to customers, except in certain cases. Establishes certain preemptive restrictions on local governments. Requires Department of Environmental Quality to report on certain impacts. Punishes violations by maximum fine of $250 per violation. Repeals statute requiring retail establishments that offer plastic bags to customers to also offer paper bags.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to checkout bags.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Read and Passed (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseChapter 434, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
2019-06-20HouseGovernor signed.
2019-06-14SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-13HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-11SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 12--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Beyer, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen.
2019-06-10SenateCarried over to 06-11 by unanimous consent.
2019-06-06SenateCarried over to 06-10 by unanimous consent.
2019-06-05SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-05SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2019-05-29SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-04-30SenateReferred to Rules.
2019-04-29SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-25HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Noble, Smith DB.
2019-04-25HouseRead. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 18--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Witt, Zika.
2019-04-24HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2019-04-22HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-04-16HouseThird Reading. Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred.
2019-04-15HouseSecond reading.
2019-04-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-04-04HouseWork Session held.
2019-04-04HouseWork Session held.
2019-04-02HouseWork Session held.
2019-02-19HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Energy and Environment.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2509
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2509/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2509/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2509/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2509/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2509/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2509/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28709
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29117
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=461923
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29741
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=473804

Bill Comments

feedback