OR HB2506 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands definition of "residential homes" and "residential facilities" that local governments must approve under same standards as other residential uses. Expands definition of "residential homes" and "residential facilities" that local governments must approve under same standards as other residential uses. Provides attorney fees to applicants developing residential homes or facilities and to local governments that approve such applications for prevailing at Land Use Board of Appeals or on appeal from board.
Title
Relating to supportive housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Mark Gamba [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-05-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2023-04-06 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2023-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Housing and Homelessness. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |