OR HB2505 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 457, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 457, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Governor's Child Foster Care Advisory Commission to establish Child Welfare Equity Advisory Committee to advise commission and Department of Human Services regarding equitable provision of child welfare services. Directs Governor's Child Foster Care Advisory Commission to establish Child Welfare Equity Advisory Committee to advise commission and Department of Human Services regarding equitable provision of child welfare services. Requires commission to report recommendations of committee and steps taken by commission and department to implement committee's recommendations to interim committees of Legislative Assembly on or before September 1 of each even-numbered year. Directs Department of Human Services to provide staff support, including full-time equivalent policy analyst, for Governor's Child Foster Care Advisory Commission. Increases number of members on commission from 11 to 13. Modifies commission membership requirements. Directs Chief Justice of Supreme Court to appoint any member of commission who is representative of Judicial Department. Appropriates moneys to commission for purposes of Act.].
Title
Relating to Governor's Child Foster Care Advisory Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 457, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-07-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-17 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Reschke. |
2021-06-17 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-08 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-03 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-03-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |