OR HB2503 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands eligibility for certain child care subsidy programs. Expands eligibility for certain child care subsidy programs. Transfers rulemaking authority for programs from Department of Human Services to Early Learning Council. Directs council to adopt rules to implement changes to programs. Provides that when federal funds are involved, federal child subsidy program requirements control.
Title
Relating to child care subsidy programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-15 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Early Childhood with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2503 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2503/Introduced |