OR HB2503 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 499, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 29, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 499, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 29, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Health Licensing Office to issue lactation consultant licenses to qualified applicants. Requires lactation consultants to complete cultural competency and trauma-informed care continuing education courses. Prohibits unlicensed use of "lactation consultant" title and practice of lactation consultation. Provides exceptions to prohibition. Allows office to impose discipline for certain violations. Directs office to provide administrative and regulatory oversight to lactation consultation program. Imposes civil penalty for violation of licensure requirements. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to lactation professionals; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] | Rep. Philip Barnhart [D] | Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Chapter 499, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 29, 2017. |
2017-06-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-06-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 53; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Reschke; Absent, 1--Piluso; Excused, 2--Boone, Gorsek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Evans. |
2017-06-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-06-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-30 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-05-30 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |