OR HB2502 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies type of change in system for selling containers of distilled liquor that qualifies person appointed to operate liquor store for business loss compensation. Specifies type of change in system for selling containers of distilled liquor that qualifies person appointed to operate liquor store for business loss compensation. Increases percentage of average annual gross distilled liquor sales to be paid as business loss compensation. Includes as source of moneys for business loss compensation percentage of average annual gross distilled liquor sales. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to distilled liquor sales; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Small Business. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |