OR HB2502 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds five members to Task Force on School Safety. Adds five members to Task Force on School Safety. Modifies task force duties. Requires, to extent possible, that task force meet by telephone or video conference. Directs task force to submit fourth] annual report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary no later than September 1, 2022] December 1. Requires state agency with member on task force to provide staff support to task force. Extends sunset of task force to December 31, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to public safety; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] |
Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |