OR HB2502 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of State Lands to study and develop recommendations for developing and organizing ocean power districts. Requires report to be submitted to interim committees related to environment and natural resources on or before September 15, 2018. Sunsets on December 31, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to ocean power districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback