OR HB2499 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 158, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 158, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes process for vessel permit seller to petition for preliminary injunction allowing seller to continue to fish under vessel permit during pendency of proceeding concerning claim that buyer failed to fulfill terms of vessel permit sale. Authorizes State Fish and Wildlife Commission to adopt rules to allow for relief necessary to comply with preliminary injunctions.
Title
Relating to limited entry fishery permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 158, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Boone, Lininger, McKeown, Piluso; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Smith G. |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 20, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-18 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |