OR HB2497 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires State Fish and Wildlife Commission to establish and prescribe fees for multiyear resident and nonresident hunting licenses. Sets agent fee for issuance of each multiyear license at $5.
Title
Relating to hunting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2497 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2497/Introduced |