OR HB2496 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 160, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 160, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Includes battery storage in definition of "green energy technology." Defines "total contract price." Permits contracting agency, as alternative to including green energy technology in construction, reconstruction or major renovation of public building, to make expenditure to improve energy use efficiency in public building. Adds requirement to show results of analysis of total solar resource fraction that applies to site on which contracting agency intends to construct green energy technology that uses solar energy for space or water heating or to generate electricity. Permits contracting agency to use green energy for space or water heating or to generate electricity if total solar resource fraction exceeds 75 percent. Permits contracting agency to enter into agreement with another contracting agency to pool resources or share costs related to including green energy technology or woody biomass energy technology or making expenditure to improve building energy use efficiency in construction, reconstruction or major renovation] consolidate in one public building, or in one location away from site of public building, all or substantial proportion of green energy technology that contracting agency would otherwise include as part of construction, reconstruction or major renovation of public building if total amount that contracting agency expends on green energy technology is aggregate of all amounts contracting agency must expend on each public building that is part of same project and if project, taken as whole, otherwise meets requirements of Act. Becomes operative on January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to energy conservation in public buildings; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 160, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-05-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Johnson, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 14--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Drazan, Findley, Leif, Lewis, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Sprenger, Wallan, Wilson, Witt; Excused, 2--Prusak, Stark. |
2019-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 22, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-17 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |