OR HB2495 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to chemicals in children's products. Revises provisions relating to chemicals in children's products. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to chemicals in children's products; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-19 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2021-04-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Neron. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 8--Boshart Davis, Cate, Drazan, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan; Excused, 5--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Leif, Levy, Nearman. |
2021-04-16 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-15 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |