OR HB2495 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes privilege taxes on merchantable forest products harvested on forestlands permanent and increases rate of tax levied for payment of benefits related to fire suppression. Creates Wildfire Suppression Fund and directs to fund portion of tax levied for payment of benefits related to fire suppression. Provides that State Forester may expend moneys from separate request for General Fund appropriation only if available moneys in Wildfire Suppression Fund are insufficient for expenditure. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to forest management; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-16 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2495 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2495/Introduced |