OR HB2494 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes legislative Task Force on the Impacts of COVID-19 on Health Care Delivery Systems to evaluate impacts of COVID-19 on health care delivery systems in this state. Establishes legislative Task Force on the Impacts of COVID-19 on Health Care Delivery Systems to evaluate impacts of COVID-19 on health care delivery systems in this state. Sunsets December 31, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to health care; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On COVID-19. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2494 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2494/Introduced |