OR HB2493 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to Behavioral Health by order of Speaker.
Pending: House Behavioral Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Health Licensing Office to establish and maintain voluntary alternative practitioner registry of individuals who provide alternative well-being care. Directs Health Licensing Office to establish and maintain voluntary alternative practitioner registry of individuals who provide alternative well-being care. Defines "alternative well-being care." Allows office to impose discipline for certain violations. Directs office to provide administrative and regulatory oversight to alternative well-being care program. Imposes civil penalty for violation of registry listing requirements. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to alternative well-being care; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Behavioral Health by order of Speaker.
2021-01-29HouseWithout recommendation as to passage and be referred to Behavioral Health.
2021-01-28HouseWork Session held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Health Care.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback