OR HB2490 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries to appoint long term care wage board to examine factors that may present challenges to recruiting and retaining long term care employees. Prohibits employers from retaliating against long term care employees who participate in board activities. Permits commissioner to assess civil penalty against employers that retaliate against employees. Requires moneys collected as penalties to be used to reimburse board in carrying out board's duties. Requires board to adopt recommended compensation schedule for long term care employees. Requires board to submit annual report to Bureau of Labor and Industries. Allows Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries to consider recommended schedule in establishing compensation rates for long term care employees. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the long term care wage board; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Sen. Shemia Fagan [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2490 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2490/Introduced |