OR HB2488 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that statewide land use planning goal relating to citizen involvement address participation and engagement for disadvantaged groups. Requires Land Conservation and Development Commission to make changes to statewide land use planning goals by December 31, 2026, to address climate justice by addressing climate change adaptation and mitigation and environmental justice for disadvantaged communities.] Requires Department of Land Conservation and Development to establish environmental justice advisory committee.] Requires commission to adopt interim climate justice standards for local government's use until meeting compliance with goal changes. Establishes deadlines for compliance with interim standards and changed goals.] Establishes Climate Justice Planning Goals Fund. Appropriates moneys to fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to commission for specified purposes.] Sunsets interim standards on January 2, 2030. Sunsets goal amendment process after commission certifies adoption of goal.] Requires that statewide land use planning goal relating to citizen involvement address participation and engagement for disadvantaged groups. Requires Land Conservation and Development Commission to amend goal by June 30, 2023, consistent with requirement. Establishes timelines for local governments to implement amended goal. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to commission for goal amendment and implementation. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to addressing climate justice through land use planning; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |