OR HB2488 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to adopt rules prioritizing award of Oregon Promise program grants to persons serving in Oregon National Guard who have completed initial active duty training.
Title
Relating to prioritizing Oregon National Guard members in awarding Oregon Promise program grants.
Sponsors
Sen. Cliff Bentz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2488 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2488/Introduced |