OR HB2486 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 306, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 18, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 306, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 18, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain pharmacy technicians to administer vaccines. Allows certain pharmacy technicians to administer vaccines. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to pharmacy technicians; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | House | Chapter 306, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 18, 2023. |
2023-07-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Anderson. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 7--Bonham, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Carried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-03-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 9--Boice, Cate, Cramer, Elmer, Lewis, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Reschke; Excused, 2--Javadi, Scharf; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Pham H. |
2023-03-13 | House | Second reading. |
2023-03-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-03-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |