OR HB2485 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 69, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 69, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures for adoption of restated declaration, restated assignment of use of limited common elements and restated bylaws by condominium association. Requires Real Estate Commissioner approval of restated declarations, limited residential condominium disclosure statements, nonresidential condominium documentation and amendments to declarations of condominiums. Establishes submission requirements and procedure for commissioner approval. Requires amendment procedures contained in bylaws of condominium to be consistent with provisions of law in effect at time of recording.
Title
Relating to condominiums.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 69, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Wallan; Excused, 2--Keny-Guyer, Piluso. |
2019-04-01 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |