OR HB2484 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - At President's desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - At President's desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires landlord to allow dwelling to be used as family child care home. Requires landlord to allow dwelling to be used as family child care home. Sets conditions on use. Authorizes Early Learning Council to establish rules for landlords.
Title
Relating to use of rental unit as family child care home.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Housing. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Housing. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | At President's desk upon adjournment. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 18--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Weber, Witt, Wright; Excused, 4--Levy, Morgan, Smith G, Wallan. |
2021-04-14 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-10 | House | Subsequent referral to Housing rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2021-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Housing be rescinded. |
2021-04-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Early Childhood with subsequent referral to Housing. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |