OR HB2482 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Work Session held.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes entering or remaining unlawfully in or on public transit vehicle or public transit station as manner of committing crime of interfering with public transportation. Removes entering or remaining unlawfully in or on public transit vehicle or public transit station as manner of committing crime of interfering with public transportation. Provides that use of certain name other than name displayed on government-issued identification document does not constitute crime of giving false information to peace officer in connection with citation or warrant or crime of giving false information to police officer. Prohibits police officer from conducting or participating in activities intended to determine whether person has paid certain user charges, fees or tolls imposed by mass transit district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-15HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback