OR HB2480 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Chapter 306, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Chapter 306, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that statement purporting to interpret otherwise admissible statement from one language into another does not constitute hearsay if declarant testifies. Creates exception to prohibition on recording communications for person who records conversation during or regarding commission of offense against person.] Creates exception to rule against hearsay for translation by qualified interpreter.] Expands venue for trial of two or more offenses involving domestic violence or abuse between same defendant and victim.] Requires defendant to give notice of intent to introduce evidence on issue of insanity at least 60 days before trial.] Modifies provisions relating to prior convictions for felony sex crimes in other jurisdictions.] Provides that, upon receipt of petition to initiate commitment proceedings of extremely dangerous person with mental illness, court shall order that person be held in custody pending evaluation and hearing.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to legal proceedings; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | House | Chapter 306, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2019. |
2019-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Taylor. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Carried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Barreto; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-04-15 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |