OR HB2479 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definition of "global warming" to include certain aerosol air contaminants, including black carbon. Modifies definition of "global warming" to include certain aerosol air contaminants, including black carbon. Directs Department of Environmental Quality to estimate human-caused black carbon emissions in this state and recommend mitigation strategies in report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to black carbon; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |