OR HB2475 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 90, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 90, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Public Utility Commission to consider differential energy burden and other inequities of affordability in rates. Authorizes Public Utility Commission to consider differential energy burden and other inequities of affordability in rates. Authorizes public utilities to enter into agreements to provide financial assistance for organizations to represent in regulatory proceedings before commission interests of low-income residential customers and residential customers that are members of environmental justice communities. Provides that total aggregate financial assistance available to all such organizations may not exceed $500,000 annually. Requires commission to establish process for evaluating and approving agreements. Requires commission to report by September 15, 2025, to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to energy on implementation and impacts of new authorization to provide such financial assistance. Authorizes certain measures to address mitigation of energy burdens. Requires costs of measures to be collected in rates of electric company through charges paid by all retail electricity consumers.
Title
Relating to public utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Motion to Rerefer (Y: 23 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 22 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Motion to Rerefer (Y: 23 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 22 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 90, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-05-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 11--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 10; Nays, 19--Beyer, Boquist, Burdick, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Gorsek, Jama, Johnson, Lieber, Manning Jr, Patterson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng Minority) |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng bill. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-03-16 | House | Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 20--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 3--Evans, Leif, Rayfield. |
2021-03-16 | House | Motion to rerefer to Energy and Environment failed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 33--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Clem, Dexter, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Reardon, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Wilde, Williams, Witt; Excused, 3--Evans, Leif, Rayfield. |
2021-03-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Power. |
2021-03-16 | House | Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 34--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Clem, Dexter, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Reardon, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Wilde, Williams, Witt; Excused, 3--Evans, Leif, Rayfield. |
2021-03-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-09 | House | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |