OR HB2469 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 116, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 116, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state medical assistance program to provide mental health wellness appointments as prescribed by Oregon Health Authority. Requires state medical assistance program to provide for up to six behavioral health checkups every year] mental health wellness appointments as prescribed by Oregon Health Authority.
Title
Relating to health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Behavioral Health, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Behavioral Health, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 116, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Robinson. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Anderson, Thatcher. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Cate, Evans, Levy. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-01 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2021-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2021-03-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Behavioral Health, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-01-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |