OR HB2468 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to conduct study on criminal sentencing outcomes and present report on findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary on or before September 15, 2022. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to conduct study on criminal sentencing outcomes and present report on findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary on or before September 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Criminal Justice Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2468 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2468/Introduced |