OR HB2466 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 66, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 66, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain homeowners associations and all condominium unit owners associations to carry fidelity bond coverage, unless owners and board have elected otherwise in the preceeding year. Requires certain homeowners associations and all condominium unit owners associations to be audited by certified public accountant at least once every three years if annual assessments exceed $500,000] carry fidelity bond coverage, unless owners and board have elected otherwise in the preceeding year.
Title
Relating to financial practices in associations.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 66, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Girod; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLane. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Evans, Nearman, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 2--Keny-Guyer, Piluso. |
2019-04-01 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |