OR HB2463 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Chapter 10, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Chapter 10, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits pawnbroker to store large pledge items at single storage location off premises of business location at which pawnbroker makes pledge loan if pawnbroker and pledgor agree in writing that pawnbroker may do so. Requires pawnbroker that stores pledges off premises to maintain business location that displays pawnbroker license and to maintain off-premises location that complies with security, bonding, insurance and notice requirements that apply to pawnbroker's business location. Requires pawn ticket or memorandum to state whether pawnbroker is storing or will store pledge at off-premises location. Permits Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to define by rule "large items" for purpose of Act. Becomes operative January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to requirements for pawnbrokers wishing to store large pledge items off premises; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Chapter 10, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-03-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-01-31 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2019-01-30 | House | Second reading. |
2019-01-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-01-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |