OR HB2456 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies emergency housing assistance program and state homeless assistance program to provide services and assistance to school-aged children experiencing or at risk of experiencing homelessness. Modifies emergency housing assistance program and state homeless assistance program to provide services and assistance to school-aged children experiencing or at risk of experiencing homelessness. Changes "unaccompanied homeless youth" to "youth experiencing homelessness" for purposes of certain programs. Modifies eligibility requirements for applicants for grants from homeless youth services enhancement program and host home project program. Makes programs permanent. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to youth experiencing homelessness; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-01-31HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-16HouseReferred to Housing and Homelessness.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback